EP0520313 - Plate-like pigments with modified surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. Insterburger Strasse 12 W-6233 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
Dietz, Johann, Dr. Am Bierberbach 20 W-6057 Dietzenbach / DE | 03 /
Kieser, Manfred, Dr. Händelstrasse 39 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1993/01] | Application number, filing date | 92110212.5 | 17.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914121352 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121352 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0520313 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0520313 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520313 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C09C1/00 (KR);
C01P2002/34 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,US);
C09C2200/102 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1054 (EP,US);
C09C2200/301 (EP,US);
C09C2200/307 (EP,US);
C09C2200/401 (EP,US);
C09C2220/106 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Oberflächenmodifizierte plättchenförmige Pigmente | [1993/01] | English: | Plate-like pigments with modified surfaces | [1993/01] | French: | Pigments en paillettes modifiés en surface | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0077959 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0354374 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | [AD] - ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR CHEMIE, Bd. 28 JG, Nr. 2, 1988, LEIPZIG, DE Seiten 76 - 77 G. PFAFF 'HERSTELLUNG VON BATIO3-SINTERPULVER DURCH F[LLUNG VON BATIO2(O2).3H2O' | [AD] - ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR CHEMIE, Bd. 30 JG, Nr. 10, 1990, LEIPZIG, DE Seiten 379 - 380 G. PFAFF 'HERSTELLUNG VON KOMPLEXEN BARIUMTITANAT-SINTERPULVERN DURCH F[LLUNG DER TITANYLOXALATE' |