EP0520315 - Metering pump dispenser for liquid or pasty products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raimund Andris GmbH & Co. KG Spohnplatz 5 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1993/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weag, Ernst Jurastrasse 18 W-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen 22 / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Neymeyer, Franz Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Haselweg 20 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [1993/01] | Neymeyer, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Haselweg 20 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110234.9 | 17.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914120644 | 22.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4120644 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520315 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520315 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B65D47/34 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B05B11/0054 (EP,US);
B67D3/00 (KR);
B05B11/0038 (EP,US);
B05B11/028 (EP,US);
B05B11/1005 (EP,US);
B05B11/103 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Dosierpumpenspender für flüssige und/oder pastöse Medien | [1993/01] | English: | Metering pump dispenser for liquid or pasty products | [1993/01] | French: | Distributeur à pompes doseuses pour produits liquides ou pateux | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54137703 ; | [A]FR2479152 (VALOIS SA [FR]); | [AD]DE3837704 (ANDRIS RAIMUND [DE]); | [A]EP0427609 (STEP SOC TECH PULVERISATION [FR]); | [AP]EP0452260 (PLASCO SA [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 003 (M-087)11. Januar 1980 & JP-A-54 137 703 ( TOSHIBA MACH. CO. LTD ) 25. Oktober 1979, & JP54137703 A 00000000 |