EP0519485 - Propellant for gas generators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2005/11] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel GmbH Explosivstoff- und Systemtechnik Kaiserstrasse 1 53839 Troisdorf / DE | ||
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redecker, Klaus, Dr. Burgfarrnbacher Strasse 34 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Weuter, Waldemar, Dr. Dambacher Weg 8 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Müller, Karl-Ernst Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Schmidt, Christian, Dipl.-Phys., et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | Scherzberg, Andreas, Dr., et al Patente, Marken & Lizenzen c/o Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110353.7 | 19.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | DE19914120599 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4120599 | [1992/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519485 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C06D5/06, C06B43/00 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
C06D5/06 (EP,US);
C06B43/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | Treibmittel für Gasgeneratoren | [1992/52] | English: | Propellant for gas generators | [1992/52] | French: | Propellent pour générateurs de gaz | [1992/52] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2000 | Request for further processing for: | 19.04.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2063586 ; | [A]DE3933554 ; | [X]US4386979 (JACKSON JR CHARLES H [US]); | [XP]EP0482852 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 084, no. 18, 3. Mai 1976, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 124138e, H. SHIMIZU ET AL. 'Gas-forming compositions' Seite 138 ; |