EP0520372 - Inositol phosphate analogues as calcium-antagonistic substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiebler, Werner Dr. Dresdener Strasse 5 D-6093 Flörsheim / DE | 02 /
Deckert, Elke Heimchenweg 86 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | 03 /
Dreef, Eric Dr.c/o Gorlaeus Laboratoria Einsteinweg 5,Postbus 9502 NL-2300 RA Leiden / NL | 04 /
v.d. Marel, Geijs Dr., c/o Golaeus Laboratoria Einsteinweg 5, Postbus 9502 NL-2300 RA Leiden / NL | 05 /
von Boom, Jacques Prof., c/o Gorlaeus Laboratoria Einsteinweg 5, Postbus 9502 NL-2300 RA Leiden / NL | [1996/49] |
Former [1993/01] | 01 /
Schiebler, Werner Dr. Dresdener Strasse 5 W-6093 Flörsheim / DE | ||
02 /
Deckert, Elke Heimchenweg 86 W-6230 Frankfurt am Main80 / DE | |||
03 /
Dreef, Eric Dr.c/o Gorlaeus Laboratoria Einsteinweg 5,Postbus 9502 2300 RA Leiden / NL | |||
04 /
v.d.Marel, Geijs Dr., c/o Golaeus Laboratoria Einsteinweg 5, Postbus 9502 2300 RA Leiden / NL | |||
05 /
von Boom, Jacques Prof., c/0 Gorlaeus Laboratoria Einsteinweg 5, Postbus 9502 2300 RA Leiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 92110563.1 | 23.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | EP19910110546 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: EP 91110546 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520372 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520372 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, A61K31/66, C07F9/117 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
C07F9/4081 (EP,US);
C07F9/38 (KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07F9/117 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Inositol-Phosphat-Analog als kalzium-antagonistische Substanz | [1996/49] | English: | Inositol phosphate analogues as calcium-antagonistic substances | [1993/01] | French: | Analogues de phosphate d'inositol comme substances à action antagoniste du calcium | [1993/01] |
Former [1993/01] | Inositol-Phosphat-Analog als Kalzium-antagonistische Substanze | Examination procedure | 21.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4515722 (YANG SHU S [US], et al); | [Y]EP0262227 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [Y]EP0269105 (SIREN MATTI) | [Y] - TETRAHEDRON, (INCL. TETRAHEDRON REPORTS) vol. 47, no. 26, 24 June 1991, OXFORD GB pages 4709 - 4722; C.E. DREEF ET AL.: 'synthesis of racemic 3-methylphosphonate analogues of myo-inositol 3,4-bis- and 1,3,4-trisphosphate' | Examination | - Houben-Weyl "Organische Phosphorverbindungen" part 1, 1983, K. SASSE, pp. 4-5 | - J. Chem. Soc., Chem. Commun. 1989, A.M. COOKE et al., p. 269 | - J. Chem. Soc., Chem. Commun. 1990, J.R. FALCK et al., p. 953 |