EP0520424 - An antenna apparatus for moving body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | For all designated states SYSTEM UNIQUES CORPORATION 79-2, Kamoshida Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 272 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
For all designated states SYSTEM UNIQUES CORPORATION 79-2, Kamoshida Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uematsu, Masahiro, c/o Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kato, Kazuo, c/o System Uniques Corporation 79-2, Kamoshida, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110669.6 | 25.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | JP19910182031 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: JP 18203191 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0520424 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0520424 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520424 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/27, H01Q3/08 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3275 (EP,US);
H01Q3/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/01] | H01Q1/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Antennenvorrichtung für einen sich bewegenden Körper | [1993/01] | English: | An antenna apparatus for moving body | [1993/01] | French: | Appareil d'antenne pour un corps en mouvement | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.05.1996 | [1997/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0338379 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0373604 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) |