EP0520508 - Process for preparing thermo-insulating and/or structural double-walled molded bodies and products thereby obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTELL ITALIA S.p.A. Via Rosellini 19 20124 Milano / IT | [1997/05] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states CENTRO SVILUPPO SETTORI IMPIEGO S.r.l. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addeo, Antonio 8, via Cerutti I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
Vezzoli, Annibale 1/A, via Piave I-22060 Carugo, Como / IT | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110863.5 | 26.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI01797 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: IT MI911797 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520508 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520508 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/16, B32B31/00, B29C63/04, // B29K105/04 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B32B37/185 (EP,US);
B29C51/16 (EP,US);
B32B37/04 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C51/082 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0015 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B29L2022/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/02] |
Former [1993/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung wärmeisolierender Formkörper und damit herstellbare Formkörper | [1993/01] | English: | Process for preparing thermo-insulating and/or structural double-walled molded bodies and products thereby obtained | [1993/01] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'éléments structuraux moulés isolants et éléments ainsi obtenus | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61078624 ; | [A]EP0291854 (DELTA KOGYO CO [JP]); | [X]EP0413344 (SVILUPPO SETTORI IMPIEGO SRL [IT]); | [XP]EP0480451 (SVILUPPO SETTORI IMPIEGO SRL [IT]) | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8622, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, AN 86-141897 & JP-A-61 078 624 (SEIWA KK), & JP61078624 A 00000000 |