EP0525406 - Tube cutting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BÜLTMANN, Monika Küntroper Strasse 194 D-58809 Neuenrade / DE | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bültmann, Rudolf Küntroper Strasse 194 W-5982 Neuenrade 2 / DE | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Edmund Lothar, et al Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Malteserstraße 10a 50859 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Mühlenberg 74 D-59759 Arnsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110946.8 | 29.06.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | DE19914123628 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123628 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525406 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23D21/04, B23B31/14 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B23D21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/05] | Title | German: | Rohrtrennmaschine | [1993/05] | English: | Tube cutting apparatus | [1993/05] | French: | Dispositif de coupe de tubes | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0426234 ; | [Y]DE3113072 ; | [Y]DE2542570 ; | [Y]DE3231536 |