EP0523446 - Method and apparatus for continuously monitoring the content of chlorides in flue gas gypsum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Knauf Westdeutsche Gipswerke KG Postfach 10 D-97343 Iphofen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states Gebr. Knauf Westdeutsche Gipswerke KG Postfach 10 D-97343 Iphofen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüller, Rolf. Dr. Zum Steinbruch 16 W-8712 Volkach / DE | 02 /
Wirsching, Franz, Dr. In den Weinbergen 7 W-8715 Iphofen / DE | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111104.3 | 01.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | DE19914123736 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123736 | [1993/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523446 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523446 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/38 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur laufenden Kontrolle des Gehaltes von Chloriden in Rauchgasgips | [1993/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for continuously monitoring the content of chlorides in flue gas gypsum | [1993/03] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de la teneur en chlorures de plâtre de gaz de fumée | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Request for further processing for: | 13.04.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0397235 (GERARD HELMUT [DE]); | [AD]GB2226402 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS [DE]); | [A]DE3822847 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS [DE]) |