EP0521501 - Electrosurgical treatment instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELMA ELEKTRO-UND MEDIZINISCHE APPARATEBAU GESELLSCHAFT mbH Postfach 4052 D-78505 Tuttlingen / DE | [1993/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagen, Alfred Haldenstrasse 22 W-7200 Tuttlingen 16 / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Morgan, James Garnet, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Morgan, James Garnet, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Rotermund Patentanwälte Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111209.0 | 02.07.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914122219 | 04.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4122219 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0521501 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0521501 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521501 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] |
Former [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0521501 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[1993/26] | |||
[1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/39 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A61B18/1402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB [1993/01] | Title | German: | Elektrochirurgisches Behandlungsinstrument | [1993/01] | English: | Electrosurgical treatment instrument | [1993/01] | French: | Instrument de traitement electrochirurgical | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1998 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 03.03.1998 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Request for further processing for: | 04.11.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4014343 (ESTY JANET M); | [A]FR2502935 (DOLLEY ROGER [FR]); | [A]EP0067680 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2165761 (KH OBLAST KLINICES BOLNICA); | [YD]DE3423356 ; | [A]DE3510586 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]); | [A]US4682596 (BALES THOMAS O [US], et al); | [A]EP0397910 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |