EP0522446 - Method for controlling the direction of an earth drilling apparatus and device for making bore holes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERRA AG fuer Tiefbautechnik Wiesenweg 8 CH-4802 Strengelbach / CH | [1993/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jenne, Gustav, Dr. Schmachtenbergstr. 183 W-4300 Essen 18 / DE | 02 /
Jenne, Dietmar Wiesenweg 8 CH-4802 Strengelbach / CH | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/02] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111212.4 | 02.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | DE19914122350 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4122350 | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0522446 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0522446 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522446 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/06, E21B7/18, E21B7/26, E21B4/14, E21B17/07, E21B10/38 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
E21B7/065 (EP,US);
E21B10/38 (EP,US);
E21B17/07 (EP,US);
E21B4/145 (EP,US);
E21B7/18 (EP,US);
E21B7/26 (EP,US);
E21B7/267 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI [1993/14] |
Former [1993/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Richtungssteuerung eines Erdbohrgerätes sowie Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Erdbohrungen | [1993/02] | English: | Method for controlling the direction of an earth drilling apparatus and device for making bore holes | [1993/02] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler la direction d'un appareil de forage du sol et dispositif pour l'exécution de forages | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, GR, IT, LU, MC, NL | 05.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1091510 (REUTHER TIEFBAU G M B H); | [XD]US3365007 (UVON SKIPPER); | [A]GB2126267 (COAL IND); | [X]US4787465 (DICKINSON III BEN W O [US], et al); | [Y]US4850440 (SMET NIC H W [BE]); | [Y]US4858703 (KINNAN FRANK R [US]); | [X]US4930586 (TURIN PAUL S [US], et al); | [A]US4957173 (KINNAN FRANK R [US]); | [X]US4991667 (WILKES JR ROBERT D [US], et al); | [Y]US4993503 (FISCHER EDWARD E [US], et al) |