EP0526742 - Plastic container made of two identical parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allit Kunststofftechnik Kimnach GmbH & Co. Rotlay Mühle D-55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE | [1995/10] |
Former [1993/06] | For all designated states ALLIT-PLASTIKWERK, KIMNACH GmbH & Co. Rotlay Mühle D-55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keuchel, Reinhard Soonwaldblick 10 W-6551 Spabrücken / DE | [1993/06] | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim Strasse & Hofstetter Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/06] | Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111334.6 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/06] | Priority number, date | DE19910008324U | 05.07.1991 Original published format: DE 9108324 U | [1993/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526742 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526742 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/10, A45C5/04, B65D43/16 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
A45C13/005 (EP);
A45C13/10 (EP);
A45C3/02 (EP);
A45C5/03 (EP);
B65D43/164 (EP);
B65D2251/1016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1995/14] |
Former [1993/06] | BE, DE, DK, FR, IT, LU, NL | Title | German: | Kunststoffbehälter aus zwei identischen Teilen | [1993/06] | English: | Plastic container made of two identical parts | [1993/06] | French: | Conteneur en plastique constitué de deux parties identiques | [1993/06] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0375925 (SCHWEINSBERG DATOX ORG [DE]); | [A]US3642102 (FURNISS WILLIAM R, et al); | [A]DE8531189U ; | [A]DE8902721U |