EP0521528 - Electric motor, in particular windshield wiper motor of an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states SWF Auto-Electric GmbH Postfach 1763 D-74307 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruhn, Rainer Römerstrasse 22 W-75 Karlsruhe 21 / DE | 02 /
Walther, Bernd Birkenweg 20 W-7120 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/16] |
Former [1993/34] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111363.5 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914122293 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4122293 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521528 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521528 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
H02K11/026 (EP);
B60S1/08 (EP);
H02K11/40 (EP);
H02K23/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Motor, insbesondere Scheibenwischermotor eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1993/01] | English: | Electric motor, in particular windshield wiper motor of an automotive vehicle | [1993/01] | French: | Moteur électrique, notamment moteur d'essuie-glace de véhicule automobile | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 09.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Request for further processing for: | 10.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3542632 ; | [A]US4350938 ; | [A]DE3736388 ; | [A]DE2707288 ; | [A]GB2079540 |