EP0522474 - Non-yellowing, paintable plastisol compositions, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ems-Togo AG Hofstrasse 31 8590 Romanshorn / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states Ems-Togo AG Hofstrasse 31 CH-8590 Romanshorn / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brito Marqina, Jose Aconcagna 22 No. 1 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
Garcia Ferreira, Juan Urbaniation Santa Fe, Calle 2, No. 19 Zaragoza / ES | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Deufel, Paul Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Deufel, Paul, Dr. Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111369.2 | 04.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | DE19914123211 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123211 | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0522474 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0522474 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/06, C08K5/00 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C08K5/0041 (EP,US);
C09D127/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0041, C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C09D127/06, C08L2666/28 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | Vergilbungsbeständig überlackierbare Plastisolzusammensetzung, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1993/02] | English: | Non-yellowing, paintable plastisol compositions, process for their preparation and their use | [1993/02] | French: | Compositions de plastisol pouvant être peintres et résistants au jaunissement, procédé de leur préparation et leur usage | [1993/02] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/40] | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3401138 (RALPH BRADY DAVID); | [Y]DE3313332 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [YD]DE3821926 (EMS TOGO AG [CH]) |