EP0577876 - Roller type hemming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRIENGINEERING Co., Ltd. 1201, Motogo 2-chome, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states TRIENGINEERING Co., Ltd. 1201, Motogo 2-chome, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawa, Masazumi, c/o Triengineering Co., Ltd. 1201, Motogo 2-chome, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim, et al Strasse & Hofstetter Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Strasse & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/02] | Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111634.9 | 09.07.1992 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577876 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577876 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/02 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
B21D39/021 (EP,US);
B21D39/023 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53065 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53787 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53791 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53996 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden eines Werkstücks | [1994/02] | English: | Roller type hemming apparatus | [1994/02] | French: | Appareil à rouleau pour joindre une pièce | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61262432 ; | [A]JP02197331 ; | [E]EP0525759 (TRIENGINEERING CO LTD [JP]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 123 (M-581)(2570) 17 April 1987 & JP-A-61 262 432 ( TORAI ENG KK ) 20 November 1986, & JP61262432 A 19861120 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 486 (M-1038)23 October 1990 & JP-A-02 197 331 ( KANTO AUTO WORKS ) 3 August 1990, & JP02197331 A 19900803 |