EP0522559 - Cloth roll exchange apparatus for a loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwano, Yoshimi, c/o K. K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Makino, Yoichi, c/o K. K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Furuta, Tetsuya, c/o K. K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111712.3 | 09.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | JP19910170029 | 10.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17002991 | JP19910314854 | 28.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31485491 | JP19910316955 | 29.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31695591 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522559 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522559 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D03J1/00 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
D03J1/001 (EP,US);
D03D49/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT [1993/02] | Title | German: | Warenbaumwechsler für eine Webmaschine | [1993/02] | English: | Cloth roll exchange apparatus for a loom | [1993/02] | French: | Dispositif de changement de l'ensouple de tissu pour un métier à tisser | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS60177143U ; | [AD]JPS6123060 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD); | [A]US4606381 (SUWA MITSURU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0296113 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]EP0296115 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]BE1000684 (PICANOL NV); | [AD]JPH0197241 (SAN M SHOKAI KK); | [AD]JPH0252839 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]EP0405551 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [XP]EP0438972 (SULZER AG [CH]) |