EP0528173 - Sensor controlled cleaning-start for a pyrolytic oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waigand, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Traunstrasse 18d W-8221 St. Georgen / DE | 02 /
Wallner, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Seefischerwerk W-8221 Tengling / DE | [1993/08] | Application number, filing date | 92111995.4 | 14.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | DE19914127388 | 19.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4127388 | [1993/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528173 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528173 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
F24C14/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/08] | Title | German: | Herd mit sensorgesteuertem Pyrolysestart | [1993/08] | English: | Sensor controlled cleaning-start for a pyrolytic oven | [1993/08] | French: | Four à démarrage de nettoyage par pyrolyse commandé par un capteur | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4481404 (THOMAS CHARLES E [US], et al); | [A]EP0380733 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0459131 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [AP]DE9112786U |