EP0524543 - Distributing transportation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi, Kayaba-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi, Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Atsushi No. 52-20 Imaizumishinmachi Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Naramoto, Masao, c/o RECORDING & IMAG. SCIENCE LAB Kao Corp. No. 2606, Ooaza Akabane, Ichikaimachi Haga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | von Bülow, Tam Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | von Bülow, Tam, Dr. Patentanwalt Mailänder Strasse 13 D-81545 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/04] | von Bülow, Tam, Dr. Patentanwalt Dr. Tam von Bülow Mailänder Strasse 13 D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112109.1 | 15.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | JP19910187542 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18754291 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524543 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B65G17/005 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES [1993/04] | Title | German: | Verteil-Transportvorrichtung | [1993/04] | English: | Distributing transportation device | [1993/04] | French: | Dispositif de transport de distribution | [1993/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.05.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3731782 (DEL ROSSO V); | [A]US3987888 (WICKAM IRWIN EDWARD); | [A]US4223777 (AYKUT KURT) |