EP0523709 - Polyurethane composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | ||
For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | |||
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | ||
For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron, Ohio 44313-1719 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Masahiko 6-8-2, Betsumei Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | 02 /
Hosokawa, Shigeo 2-5-45, Umaokoshi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | 03 /
Yokomori, Yorozu 2273-1, Ikuwacho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | 04 /
Ito, Yukiyoshi 2212-192, Ikuwacho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | 05 /
Hisamura, Koji 29-2-701, Sanguudori Kuwana-shi, Mie / JP | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112187.7 | 16.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | JP19910268093 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: JP 26809391 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523709 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08K5/3435, C08K5/3462, C08L75/04 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
C08G18/0819 (EP,US);
C08G71/04 (KR);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08K5/3462 (EP,US);
G11B5/7021 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3435, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/3462, C08L75/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU [1993/03] | Title | German: | Polyurethanzusammensetzung | [1993/03] | English: | Polyurethane composition | [1993/03] | French: | Composition de polyuréthane | [1993/03] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 24.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/49] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0148970 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0272587 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4721531 (WILDEMAN GEORGE F [US], et al) |