EP0578857 - Method of melting adhesive thermo- or duroplastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEINMEYER KLEBETECHNIK GmbH Postfach 1223 D-65517 Bad Camberg / DE | [1994/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mielke, Norbert Im Kirchfeld 11 W-6384 Schmitten 1 / DE | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar, et al Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112198.4 | 17.07.1992 | [1994/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578857 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/02, // B29K27/18 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
B29B13/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schmelzen von klebrigen, thermo- oder duroplastischen Massen | [1994/03] | English: | Method of melting adhesive thermo- or duroplastic materials | [1994/03] | French: | Procédé pour fondre des matériaux adhésifs thermo- ou duroplastiques | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/44] | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0362802 ; | [Y]FR2510431 ; | [Y]DE3625358 ; | [A]WO9107264 ; | [A]EP0469564 |