EP0526783 - Tool shaft blocking device, dental handpiece head provided with this device, and dental handpiece provided with such a head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIEN-AIR SA Länggasse 60 CH-2504 Bienne / CH | [1993/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosimann, David Chemin des Roseaux 8 CH-2503 Bienne / CH | [1993/06] | Representative(s) | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 92112226.3 | 17.07.1992 | [1993/06] | Priority number, date | FR19910009711 | 29.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9109711 | [1993/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526783 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526783 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/14, B23B31/02 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
A61C1/141 (EP);
B23B31/103 (EP);
A61C1/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1993/06] | Title | German: | Werkzeugspannvorrichtung, mit dieser Vorrichtung ausgerüsteter Kopf für zahnärtzliches Handstück und mit diesem Kopf ausgerüstetes Handstück | [1993/06] | English: | Tool shaft blocking device, dental handpiece head provided with this device, and dental handpiece provided with such a head | [1993/06] | French: | Dispositif de blocage d'un manche d'outil, tête de pièce à main pourvue de ce dispositif et pièce à main dentaire équipée d'une telle tête | [1993/06] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4575338 (MAIZENBERG LEONID I [US]); | [AD]CH664516 (MOSIMANN DAVID) |