EP0523737 - Pallet having reduced dimensions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schoeller-Plast S.A. 11, route de la Condémine 1680 Romont / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states Schoeller-Plast S.A. 11, route de la Condémine CH-1680 Romont / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umiker, Hans Brunnenwiese 31 CH-8132 Egg/ZH / CH | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112274.3 | 17.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | DE19914123724 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123724 | [1993/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0523737 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0523737 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523737 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/24, B65D19/38 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
B65D19/38 (EP);
B65D19/0018 (EP);
B65D2519/00034 (EP);
B65D2519/00069 (EP);
B65D2519/00268 (EP);
B65D2519/00288 (EP);
B65D2519/00318 (EP);
B65D2519/00338 (EP);
B65D2519/00771 (EP);
B65D2519/0094 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1993/03] | Title | German: | Teilpalette | [1993/03] | English: | Pallet having reduced dimensions | [1993/03] | French: | Palette de dimension réduite | [1993/03] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/18: Teilanmeldung 95106270.2 eingereicht am 17/07/92 | EPB 1996/18: Divisional application 95106270.2 filed on 17/07/92 | EPB 1996/18: Demande divisionnaire 95106270.2 déposée le 17/07/92 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95106270.2 / EP0669258 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3641949 [ ] (MONK HOMER L); | DE2905266 [ ] (FERRERO OHG); | EP0183600 [ ] (GERVAIS DANONE CO [FR]); | DE3528959 [ ] (WERKSTATT FUER BEHINDERTE LEBE [DE]); | US4694962 [ ] (TAUB RONALD H [US]); | US4809618 [ ] (BELL JOSEPH P [US]); | DE9107837U [ ] | Examination | DE1556565 | FR2310277 | DE9106619U |