EP0524558 - Superluminescent optical source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [1998/41] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago, Illinois 60602 / US | ||
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states GI CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | ||
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, David R. 68 Country Club Drive Warrington, Pennsylvania 18976 / US | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112300.6 | 18.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | US19910732097 | 18.07.1991 Original published format: US 732097 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0524558 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0524558 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524558 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/16, H01S3/06 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
H04B10/2912 (EP,US);
H01S3/0675 (EP,US);
H01S3/06795 (EP,US);
H04B10/291 (EP,US);
H04B10/506 (EP,US);
H01S3/08086 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/04] | H04B10/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | Superlumineszierende optische Quelle | [1993/04] | English: | Superluminescent optical source | [1993/04] | French: | Source optique superluminescente | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1175787 ; | [A]US4923279 (AINSLIE BENJAMIN J [GB], et al); | [X]EP0372907 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [A]GB2227359 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO9104594 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 453 (E-831)11 October 1989 & JP-A-1 175 787 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC ), & JP1175787 A 19891011 |