EP0528185 - Car storage apparatus for car carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states SEIRYO ENGINEERING CO., LTD 1-14, Wadamiya-dori 7-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states SEIRYO ENGINEERING CO., LTD 1-14, Wadamiya-dori 7-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Yoshitaka, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach.Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Koichi, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Kuribayashi, Shuhei c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach.Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Noda, Akiko, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Nakashima, Takuya, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Saito, Ryutaro, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 07 /
Tsuji, Kae, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 08 /
Mori, Hideo, c/o Kobe Shipyard & Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K., 1-1, Wadasaki-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 09 /
Mori, Yoshinori, c/o SEIRYO ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 1-14, Wadamiya-dori 7-chome Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Hoijtink, Reinoud Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 92112338.6 | 20.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | JP19910065579U | 24.07.1991 Original published format: JP 6557991 U | JP19910064853U | 22.07.1991 Original published format: JP 6485391 U | JP19910293712 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: JP 29371291 | JP19910302370 | 22.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30237091 | JP19910093241U | 17.10.1991 Original published format: JP 9324191 U | JP19910309765 | 29.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30976591 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528185 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528185 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B63B25/00, B63B25/20, E04H6/18 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B63B25/00 (KR);
B63B25/002 (EP,US);
B63B25/20 (EP,US);
E04H6/182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/08] | Title | German: | Autoverstaugerät für ein Autotransportschiff | [1993/08] | English: | Car storage apparatus for car carrier | [1993/08] | French: | Dispositif d'arrimage de voitures pour un bateau transporteur de voitures | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61105288 ; | [Y]US1584080 (DINKELBERG FREDERICK P); | [Y]US2916166 (BIGLER ALLEN R); | [Y]US2970705 (WITT JR CLARENCE M DE, et al); | [A]EP0340673 (SHAKBAR INVESTMENTS LTD [IL]); | [A]EP0380711 (WU SHUN CHING) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 291 (M-522)(2347) 3 October 1986 & JP-A-61 105 288 ( KURUSHIMA DOCK K.K. ), & JP61105288 A 19861003 |