EP0526795 - Process for the production of a photographic image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wingender, Kaspar Rüttersweg 53 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1993/06] | Application number, filing date | 92112415.2 | 21.07.1992 | [1993/06] | Priority number, date | DE19914125756 | 03.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4125756 | [1993/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526795 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526795 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, B42D15/10 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
G03C7/24 (EP,US);
B42D25/309 (US);
B42D25/00 (US);
B42D25/42 (EP);
G03C7/302 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines fotografischen Bildes | [1993/06] | English: | Process for the production of a photographic image | [1993/06] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'une image photographique | [1993/06] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP51151134 ; | [A]GB1016369 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]US4216285 (MILLER HARRIS R [US]); | [AD]EP0342601 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]US4954425 (IWANO HARUHIKO [JP]); | [A]WO9013059 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1, no. 57 3. Juni 1977 & JP-A-51 151 134 ( FUJI PHOTO FILM KK ) 25. Dezember 1976, & JP51151134 A 00000000 |