EP0525667 - Remote control signal processing circuit for a microcomputer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1996 | Examination report or reply | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimohara, Kazunari, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112683.5 | 24.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | JP19910184250 | 24.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18425091 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525667 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G08C25/00, G08C19/28 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
G08C19/28 (EP,US);
G08C25/00 (EP,US);
H04L7/0331 (EP,US);
H04L7/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/05] | Title | German: | Fernsteuerungssignal-Verarbeitungsschaltung für einen Mikrorechner | [1993/05] | English: | Remote control signal processing circuit for a microcomputer | [1993/05] | French: | Circuit de traitement de signal de commande à distance pour un microcalculateur | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57131033 ; | [A]JP63169826 ; | [A]JP61157098 ; | [A]FR2397763 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS vol. 15, no. 7, July 1982, BRISTOL GB pages 755 - 759 S.K.GHOSH ET AL 'A telecommand system for ballon payloads' | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 229 (P-155)16 November 1982 & JP-A-57 131 033 ( MEIDENSHA KK ) 13 August 1982, & JP57131033 A 19820813 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 435 (E-683)16 November 1988 & JP-A-63 169 826 ( MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP ) 13 July 1988, & JP63169826 A 19880713 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 359 (E-460)(2416) 3 December 1986 & JP-A-61 157 098 ( TOSHIBA CORP ) 16 July 1986, & JP61157098 A 19860716 |