EP0525717 - Fiber optical humidity sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses 92111 Clichy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses F-92111 Clichy Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonicel, Jean-Pierre 14, rue des Tourelles F-69005 Lyon / FR | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112851.8 | 28.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | FR19910009890 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: FR 9109890 | [1993/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525717 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525717 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N19/10, G01D5/26 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
G01N19/10 (EP,US);
G01D5/35377 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/05] | Title | German: | Feuchtigkeitssensor mit optischer Faser | [1993/05] | English: | Fiber optical humidity sensor | [1993/05] | French: | Capteur d'humidité à fibre optique | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0086024 (NEDERLANDEN STAAT [NL]); | [A]DE3327158 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0240100 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO [US]); | [A]EP0357253 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY. vol. LT-4, no. 7, Juillet 1986, NEW YORK US pages 833 - 836 M. IZUTSU ET AL. 'Integrated Optic Temperature and Humidity Sensors' | [AD] - NTT REVIEW vol. 3, no. 1, Janvier 1991, pages 97 - 104 N. TOMITA ET AL. 'Optical Fiber Line Support System' |