EP0529334 - Liquid delivery and vaporization system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKS INSTRUMENTS, INC. Six Shattuck Road Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states MKS INSTRUMENTS, INC. Six Shattuck Road Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewing, James H. 100 Simonds Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Feldkamp, Rainer, et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp Postfach 20 20 40 80020 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp Postfach 12 11 20 D-80035 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/09] | Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp Postfach 12 11 20 D-80035 München 12 / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112946.6 | 29.07.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | US19910751173 | 28.08.1991 Original published format: US 751173 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0529334 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0529334 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529334 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/06, F04B1/00, B01D1/22, F22B27/14, F04B43/10, F04B43/00, F04B43/08, F04B7/00, F16K41/10, F04B11/00 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
B01D1/00 (KR);
B01D3/06 (EP,KR,US);
F04B43/088 (EP,US);
F04B43/107 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7782 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7836 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/34] | B01D3/06, F04B1/00, B01D1/22, F22B27/14, F04B43/10, F04B43/00, F04B43/08 | ||
Former IPC [1993/09] | B01D3/06, F04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/09] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsabgabe und Verdampfungssystem | [1993/09] | English: | Liquid delivery and vaporization system | [1993/09] | French: | Système de distribution et d'évaporation de liquide | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Request for further processing for: | 06.08.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.04.1999 | FR | 07.04.1999 | IT | 07.04.1999 | LI | 07.04.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 07.04.1999 | |
FR | 07.04.1999 | ||
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 07.04.1999 | |
LI | 07.04.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 12.07.1999 | |
LI | 12.07.1999 | ||
FR | 03.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 03.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2581442 (BRENOT CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 16; figure - *; | [A]EP0023855 (BRENOT CLAUDE GEORGES) [A] 1-3,5,6 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 21 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 20 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 8; figure 1 *; | [AP]DE4029071 (EL MASSAH SOBHY AHMED [DE]) [AP] 1-3 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 44; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0341031 (NUPRO CO [US]) [X] 7-12 * column 4, line 46 - column 7, line 55; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0323448 (NUPRO CO [US]) [X] 7-12 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1122785 (GEORGE FRANK HARE) [X] 7 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3151562 (SWARTZ CHARLES A) [X] 13-15 * column W * [Y] 16,17; | [X]FR2188696 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0376497 (CYBOR INC [US]) [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 16,17; | [A]US4493614 (CHU RAYMOND D [US], et al) [A] 17 * column 4, line 36 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0309596 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 18-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE944669 (KNAPSACK AG) [A] 22 * page 1, line 78 - line 83; figure . *; | [A]EP0352727 (MONTEDIPE SRL [IT]); | [A]DE98324 (A.G. HOFFMANN UND A. SCHWARZ); | [A]US2949768 (RYANT JR CHARLES J, et al) |