EP0528235 - Small-sized vehicle, in particular wheel chair with foldable chair frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulrich Alber GmbH Sigmaringer Strasse 100 72458 Albstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states Ulrich Alber GmbH Sigmaringer Strasse 100 D-72458 Albstadt / DE | ||
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states HAAS & ALBER Haustechnik und Apparatebau GmbH Schmiechastrasse 50 D-72458 Albstadt-Ebingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alber, Ulrich Waldstrasse 65 W-7470 Albstadt-Laufen / DE | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Rudolf Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Hindenburgstrasse 65 D-72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113079.5 | 31.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | DE19914127257 | 17.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4127257 | [1993/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528235 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528235 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/04, A61G5/02, B60K7/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
A61G5/04 (EP,US);
A61G5/1032 (EP,US);
A61G5/1083 (EP,US);
B60K17/046 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (EP,US);
B60L2200/34 (EP,US);
B60L2220/20 (EP,US);
B60L2220/44 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | Kleinfahrzeug, insbesondere Rollstuhl mit faltbarem Stuhlgestell | [1993/08] | English: | Small-sized vehicle, in particular wheel chair with foldable chair frame | [1993/08] | French: | Véhicule de faible encoulement, en particulier chaise roulante avec cadre de chaise pliable | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1363649 (DUDLEY CONTROLS LTD); | [A]EP0252322 (SPASTICS SOC [GB]); | [A]GB2210589 (SPASTICS SOC [GB]); | [A]US4961473 (JONES GEORGE C [US]); | [A]WO9101897 (STEHLE JOSEF & SOEHNE [DE]); | [AP]EP0463168 (MOTOR WHEEL OVERSEAS LTD [KY]) |