EP0525807 - Opto-electronic integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Goro, c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electronic Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | ||
Former [1993/05] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113126.4 | 31.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | JP19910194525 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19452591 | JP19910194526 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19452691 | JP19910194527 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19452791 | JP19910227267 | 06.09.1991 Original published format: JP 22726791 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0525807 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0525807 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525807 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/14 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
H04B10/69 (EP,US);
H04B10/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | Optoelektronische integrierte Schaltung | [1993/05] | English: | Opto-electronic integrated circuit | [1993/05] | French: | Circuit intégré optoélectronique | [1993/05] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/20: (deleted) | EPB 1997/20: (deleted) | EPB 1997/20: (deleted) | EPB 1996/46: Teilanmeldung 96113911.0 eingereicht am 30/08/96 | EPB 1996/46: Divisional application 96113911.0 filed on 30/08/96 | EPB 1996/46: Demande divisionnaire 96113911.0 déposée le 30/08/96 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96113911.0 / EP0751636 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2164515 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH) | [ ] - OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE 19 February 1991, page 3 KEIGO AGA ET AL. 'HIGH-SPEED EIGHT-CHANNEL OPTOELECTRONIC INTEGRATED RECEIVER ARRAYS COMPRISING GAINAS PIN PDS AND ALINAS/GAINAS HEMTS' | [ ] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS vol. 26, no. 22, 25 October 1990, STEVENAGE, GB pages 1833 - 1834 W. S. LEE ET AL. 'MONOLITHIC INTEGRATION OF AN INP/INGAAS FOUR-CHANNEL TRANSIMPEDANCE OPTICAL RECEIVER ARRAY' |