EP0526868 - Disposable absorbent pant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suprise, Jody Dorothy 113 Harrison Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 02 /
Van Gompel, Paul Theodore W9029 School Road Hortonville, Wisconsin 54944 / US | 03 /
Popp, Robert Lee 805 Giese Street Hortonville, Wisconsin 54944 / US | [1993/06] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113222.1 | 03.08.1992 | [1993/06] | Priority number, date | US19910741277 | 07.08.1991 Original published format: US 741277 | [1993/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0526868 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0526868 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
A61F13/49011 (EP);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/49015 (EP);
A61F13/49017 (EP);
A61F13/496 (EP);
A61F2013/4909 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/06] | Title | German: | Absorbierendes Wegwerfhöschen | [1993/06] | English: | Disposable absorbent pant | [1993/06] | French: | Slip absorbant à jeter | [1993/06] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/20] | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4842596 [ ] (KIELPIKOWSKI DAVID P [US], et al); | EP0320991 [ ] (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | EP0323040 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | WO8807337 [ ] (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | GB2244422 [ ] (KAO CORP [JP]); | US4747846 [ ] (BOLAND LEONA G [US], et al); | EP0312071 [ ] (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | US4743239 [ ] (COLE SHELLEY K [US]) |