EP0582724 - Method of CVD deposition of SiO2 layers with local and global planarization on structured silicon substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hieber, Konrad, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Am Herrenholz 10 W-8011 Neukeferloh / DE | 02 /
v. Tomkewitsch, Jasper, Dipl.-Phys. Friedrich-Eb. W-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | 03 /
Spindler, Oswald, Dr. rer. nat. Lortzinger Strasse 16 W-8011 Vaterstetten / DE | 04 /
Treichel, Helmuth, Dipl.-Ing. Weldishofer Strasse 4 W-8900 Augsburg / DE | 05 /
Gabric, Zvonimir Herzog-Rudolf-Weg 25 W-8011 Zorneding / DE | 06 /
Gschwandtner, Alexander, Dr. Phil. Elsenheimerstrasse 18 W-8000 München 21 / DE | [1994/07] | Application number, filing date | 92113281.7 | 04.08.1992 | [1994/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582724 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/90, H01L21/316 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
H01L21/02216 (EP,US);
H01L21/02164 (EP,US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP,US);
H01L21/02315 (EP,US);
H01L21/31612 (US);
H01L21/76819 (EP,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP);
H01L21/02211 (EP);
H01L21/02274 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1994/15] |
Former [1994/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur lokal und global planarisierenden CVD-Abscheidung von SiO2-Schichten auf strukturierten Siliziumsubstraten | [1994/07] | English: | Method of CVD deposition of SiO2 layers with local and global planarization on structured silicon substrates | [1994/07] | French: | Procédé de dépôt chimique en phase vapeur de couches de SiO2 planarisées localement et globalement sur des substrats en silicium structurés | [1994/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, ES, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 04.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 15.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/17] | 25.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/17] | Request for further processing for: | 16.04.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4107924 ; | [A]EP0171605 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4614021 (HULSEWEH TERRY S [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 347 (E-1240)27. Juli 1992 & JP-A-4 107 924 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 9. April 1992, & JP4107924 A 00000000 | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY Bd. 138, Nr. 12, Dezember 1991, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US Seiten 3727 - 3732 K.FUJINO ET AL. 'LOW TEMPERATURE AND ATMOSPHERIC PRESSURE CVD USING POLYSILOXANE, OMCTS, AND OZONE' |