EP0534104 - Radiant tube with jacket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WS Wärmeprozesstechnik GmbH Dornierstrasse 14 D-71272 Renningen / DE | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wünning, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Berghalde 20 W-7250 Leonberg 7 / DE | 02 /
Wünning, Joachim G., Dipl.-Ing. Weidenweg 10 W-5100 Aachen / DE | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113411.0 | 06.08.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | DE19914132235 | 27.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4132235 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0534104 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0534104 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534104 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23C3/00 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
F23C3/002 (EP,US);
F27D7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Mantelstrahlheizrohr | [1993/13] | English: | Radiant tube with jacket | [1993/13] | French: | Tube radiant avec enveloppe | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.11.1995 | GB | 02.11.1995 | SE | 02.02.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [1996/47] | GB | 02.11.1995 | |
SE | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 02.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2314118 ; | [AD]DE3447603 |