EP0526904 - Locking cylinder, especially for a mortise lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 48291 Telgte / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 D-48291 Telgte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spahn, Karl Heinz Kattmannskamp 4 W-4412 Ostbevern / DE | 02 /
Wienert, Dieter Holzfeld 20 W-4403 Senden / DE | 03 /
Schunck, Alfred Wermelingstrasse 5 W-4400 Münster / DE | 04 /
Hohmann, Hans Ossenkampstiege 59c W-4400 Münster / DE | [1993/06] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113446.6 | 06.08.1992 | [1993/06] | Priority number, date | DE19914126160 | 07.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4126160 | [1993/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526904 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526904 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/06 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
E05B47/063 (EP);
E05B47/0004 (EP);
E05B47/0006 (EP);
E05B47/0038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/06] | Title | German: | Schliesszylinder, insbesondere für Einsteckschlösser | [1993/06] | English: | Locking cylinder, especially for a mortise lock | [1993/06] | French: | Serrure à cylindre, notamment pour serrure encastrée | [1993/06] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.05.1996 | GB | 01.05.1996 | IT | 01.05.1996 | NL | 01.05.1996 | SE | 01.08.1996 | PT | 02.08.1996 | CH | 31.08.1996 | LI | 31.08.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 01.05.1996 | |
GB | 01.05.1996 | ||
IT | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
PT | 02.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 01.05.1996 | |
IT | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
PT | 02.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | GB | 01.05.1996 | |
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
PT | 02.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | GB | 01.05.1996 | |
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
CH | 31.08.1996 | ||
LI | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 01.05.1996 | |
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 01.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0278906 (BERCHTOLD AG [CH]); | [X]EP0381320 (DOM SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]); | [A]EP0388997 (EMHART IND [US]); | [XP]EP0452298 (GRUNDMANN GMBH GEB [AT]) |