EP0529377 - Ziegler-Natta catalyst supported on AIPO4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kersting, Meinolf, Dr. Friedelsheimer Strasse 12 W-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | 02 /
Mueller, Patrik, Dr. Johanniskreuzer Strasse 67 W-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | 03 /
Schwager, Harald, Dr. Ziegelofenweg 7 W-6720 Speyer / DE | 04 /
Koelle, Peter, Dr. An der Froschlache 19 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
Weber, Siegfried, Dr. Peter-Nickel-Strasse 5 W-6940 Weinheim / DE | 06 /
Mueller, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Pfortmuellerstrasse 52 W-6718 Gruenstadt / DE | [1993/09] | Application number, filing date | 92113538.0 | 08.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | DE19914128134 | 24.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4128134 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529377 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529377 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/02 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6555 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/09] | Title | German: | Mit Aluminiumphosphat geträgerte Ziegler-Natta-Katalysatorsysteme | [1993/09] | English: | Ziegler-Natta catalyst supported on AIPO4 | [1993/09] | French: | Ziegler-Natta catalyseur supporté à d'aluminium de phosphate | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0421197 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]US4499199 (MCDANIEL MAX P [US]); | [AD]US4857613 (ZOLK RALF [DE], et al); | [AD]EP0215336 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) |