EP0582727 - Transdermal therapeutic formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states LINTEC Corporation 23-23, Honcho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okabe, Hideaki 7-7-3, Tsuji, Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuchida, Ichiro 205, Funato, Koshigaya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Saito, Takanori 2-2-604, Satsukidaira 2-chome Misato-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1994/07] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113659.4 | 11.08.1992 | [1994/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582727 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582727 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K47/32 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/07] | Title | German: | Transdermale therapeutische Formulierung | [1994/07] | English: | Transdermal therapeutic formulation | [1994/07] | French: | Compositions transdermiques thérapeutiques | [1994/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.1998
26.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.1998
26.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.1998
26.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US Opponent's representative Frohwitter, Bernhard Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | 10.02.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.05.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.06.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4291015 (KEITH ALEC D, et al); | [Y]EP0062682 (NICHIBAN KK [JP], et al); | [X]US4789547 (SONG SUK-ZU [US], et al) |