EP0527502 - Facsimile mail system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Akihiro, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113882.2 | 14.08.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | JP19910204490 | 14.08.1991 Original published format: JP 20449091 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0527502 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0527502 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527502 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [1993/07] | CPC: |
H04N1/00366 (EP,US);
H04N1/32037 (EP,US);
H04N1/32064 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N1/324 (EP,US);
H04N1/32411 (EP,US);
H04N1/32416 (EP,US);
H04N1/33323 (EP,US);
H04N1/33369 (EP,US);
H04N1/33376 (EP,US);
H04N1/32112 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3216 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3218 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3242 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/07] | Title | German: | Faksimileübertragungssystem | [1993/07] | English: | Facsimile mail system | [1993/07] | French: | Système de transmission de fac-similé | [1993/07] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP3109854 ; | [A]JP62213467 ; | [A]JP3050932 ; | [Y]US4941170 (HERBST NOEL M [US]); | [A]EP0398184 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 308 (E-1097)7 August 1991 & JP-A-3 109 854 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 9 May 1991, & JP3109854 A 19910509 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 33, no. 11, April 1991, ARMONK(US) pages 479 - 480 ANONYMOUS 'Sna network fax gateway conversions and routing' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 72 (E-588)5 March 1988 & JP-A-62 213 467 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 19 September 1987, & JP62213467 A 19870919 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 191 (E-1068)16 May 1991 & JP-A-3 050 932 ( NEC CORP. ) 5 March 1991, & JP3050932 A 19910305 |