EP0583496 - Procedure for detecting misfire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angermaier, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Renatastrasse 17 W-8300 Landshut / DE | 02 /
Wier, Manfred Dr. Ing. Ahornweg 2 W-8411 Wenzenbach / DE | 03 /
Vogt, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Hermann-Seib-Strasse 69 W-8400 Regensburg / DE | [1994/08] | Application number, filing date | 92113917.6 | 14.08.1992 | [1994/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583496 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0583496 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/00, F02P17/00 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
G01M15/11 (EP,US);
F02P17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/15] |
Former [1994/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erkennung von Verbrennungsaussetzern | [1994/08] | English: | Procedure for detecting misfire | [1994/08] | French: | Procédé de détection de ratés d'allumage | [1994/08] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL | 22.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/42] | 01.10.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.05.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 25.10.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.09.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.11.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP04101071 ; | [A]JP04113244 ; | [A]WO9209874 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE4138765 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 339 (M-1284)22. Juli 1992 & JP-A-04 101 071 ( NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD ) 2. April 1992, & JP04101071 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 365 (P-1397)6. August 1992 & JP-A-04 113 244 ( NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD ) 14. April 1992, & JP04113244 A 00000000 |