EP0513880 - Microprocessor systems for electronic postage arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Stamford, CT 06926-0790 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Check, Frank T., Jr. 999 Camillia Way San Jose, Ca. 95117 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114140.4 | 25.01.1983 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | US19820343877 | 29.01.1982 Original published format: US 343877 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0513880 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0513880 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513880 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
G07B17/00362 (EP);
G07B2017/00411 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1992/47] | Title | German: | Mikroprozessorsysteme für Frankiermaschinenanordnungen | [1992/47] | English: | Microprocessor systems for electronic postage arrangements | [1992/47] | French: | Systèmes à microprocesseur pour arrangements de machine à affranchir électronique | [1992/47] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/01: (deleted) | EPB 1997/01: (deleted) | EPB 1997/01: (deleted) | EPB 1996/38: Teilanmeldung 96110413.0 eingereicht am 27/06/96 | EPB 1996/38: Divisional application 96110413.0 filed on 27/06/96 | EPB 1996/38: Demande divisionnaire 96110413.0 déposée le 27/06/96 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP83100639.0 / EP0085385 | EP86116058.8 / EP0231452 | Divisional application(s) | EP96110413.0 / EP0736846 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE NEOPOST LTD South Street Romford, Essex, RM1 2AR / GB Opponent's representative Weinmiller, Jürgen Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [1997/49] | 24.11.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.03.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.04.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.05.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.04.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/28] | 30.04.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 15.09.1999 | Appeal received No. T0918/99 | 22.11.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.05.2002 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 21.05.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 30.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0019515 ; | [Y]DE3024370 ; | [Y]EP0017406 ; | [Y]US3544777 ; | [YD]US4301507 ; | [A]GB2079223 ; | [A]EP0026734 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 10, no. 10, March 1968, NEW YORK US pages 1484 - 1485 HACKL E.A. 'Dynamic allocation of high availability storage' | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 20, no. 10, March 1978, NEW YORK US pages 4071 - 4072 CHAMOFF E.A. 'Nonvolotile totals implementation' |