EP0531776 - Heat-resistant, hot workable austenitic steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krupp VDM GmbH Plettenberger Strasse 2 58791 Werdohl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states Krupp VDM GmbH Plettenberger Strasse 2 D-58791 Werdohl / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states KRUPP VDM GmbH Plettenberger Strasse 2 D-58791 Werdohl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brill, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Altmarkt 1a W-4220 Dinslaken / DE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114280.8 | 21.08.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | DE19914130140 | 11.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4130140 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531776 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531776 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/40 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C22C30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Hitzebeständiger warmverformbarer austenitischer Stahl | [1993/11] | English: | Heat-resistant, hot workable austenitic steel | [1993/11] | French: | Acier austénitique réfractaire déformable à chaud | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1453259 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]GB1525243 (AVESTA JERNVERKS AB); | [AD]GB2036077 (NIPPON STAINLESS STEEL CO, et al) |