EP0531795 - Contact body for an evaporation cooler, in particular for a cooling tower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munters Euroform GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 65 52072 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states Munters Euroform GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 65 D-52072 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hommel, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eupener Strasse 354 W-5100 Aachen / DE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Döring, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Mörikestrasse 18 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Döring, Wolfgang, Dr. Ing. Mörikestrasse 18 D-40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114497.8 | 26.08.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | DE19914130491 | 13.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4130491 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531795 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531795 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F28C1/16, F28C1/04 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
F28C1/04 (EP);
F28C1/14 (EP);
F28C2001/145 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Kontaktkörper für einen Verdunstungskühler, insbesondere Kühlturm | [1993/11] | English: | Contact body for an evaporation cooler, in particular for a cooling tower | [1993/11] | French: | Corps de contact pour un refroidisseur à évaporation, en particulier pour tour de refroidissement | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 25.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.10.1995 | ES | 25.10.1995 | IT | 25.10.1995 | SE | 25.01.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | DK | 25.10.1995 | |
ES | 25.10.1995 | ||
IT | 25.10.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 25.10.1995 | |
IT | 25.10.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 25.10.1995 | |
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 25.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2045082 (SVENSKA FLAEKTFABRIKEN AB); | [A]EP0137956 (WURZ DIETER); | [A]EP0151547 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP0284208 (MI RAY INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) | Examination | DE2840317 |