EP0529619 - Inter-car distance detecting device for tracking a car running ahead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asayama, Yoshiaki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Himeji Works, 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114615.5 | 27.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | JP19910217028 | 28.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21702891 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0529619 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0529619 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529619 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/12, G01S3/786 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G01S11/12 (EP,US);
G01S3/7865 (EP,US);
B60R2300/105 (EP,US);
B60R2300/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/09] | Title | German: | Entfernungsmesser für Abstand zwischen Fahrzeugen mit Nachführung des vorausfahrenden Fahrzeugs | [1993/09] | English: | Inter-car distance detecting device for tracking a car running ahead | [1993/09] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la distance entre véhicules avec poursuite du véhicule roulant en avant | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4749848 (SORIMACHI KANEHIRO [JP]); | [A]DE4006989 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |