EP0531831 - Axial piston machine for installation in a gear case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH Werk Elchingen 89012 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Brueninghaus Hydromatik GmbH Werk Elchingen D-89012 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states BRUENINGHAUS HYDRAULIK GmbH An den Kelterwiesen 14 D-72160 Horb / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pecnik, Ivan Haldenstrasse 17 W-7270 Nagold / DE | 02 /
Beck, Josef Riedwiesen 12 W-7452 Haigerloch 2 / DE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114771.6 | 28.08.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | DE19914130225 | 11.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4130225 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531831 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531831 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H39/02, F04B1/20 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
F16H39/02 (EP,US);
F04B1/2064 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Axialkolbenmaschine für den Einbau in einen Getriebekasten | [1993/11] | English: | Axial piston machine for installation in a gear case | [1993/11] | French: | Machine à pistons axiaux destinée à être montée dans un carter de boîte de vitesses | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2644033 (IFIELD ENG PTY); | [A]FR2145265 (BOSCH); | [AD]DE2633718 (LINDE AG) |