EP0529677 - Multi-channel interface for use in microcomputer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsushima, Osamu, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/09] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114869.8 | 31.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | JP19910219719 | 30.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21971991 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529677 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529677 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G06F13/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/09] | Title | German: | Vielfachkanalschnittstelle in einem Mikrocomputer | [1993/09] | English: | Multi-channel interface for use in microcomputer | [1993/09] | French: | Interface multicanal dans un microordinateur | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0145319 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INC [US]); | [X]EP0266790 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [Y]US4816996 (HILL SUSAN C [US], et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 26, no. 6, November 1983, NEW YORK US pages 3011 - 3017 C. WILLIAMS 'Narrow interface for peripheral adapters' |