EP0531874 - Imidazopyridine derivatives and process for preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honma, Yasushi No. 858-42, Oaza-koshikiya Ageo-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Sekine, Yasuo No. 22-28, Asahi 6-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Nomura, Sumihiro 1-312 Kasukabehaidensu, No. 413-1, Oaza-mashitomi Kasukabe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Naito, Kazuaki No. 1-9-8-407, Hirakawa-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Narita, Hiroshi No. 1436, Oaza-daimon Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114976.1 | 02.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | JP19910308561 | 10.09.1991 Original published format: JP 30856191 | JP19920053043 | 27.01.1992 Original published format: JP 5304392 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531874 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/44 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Imidazopyridin-Derivate und Verfahren für ihre Herstellung | [1993/11] | English: | Imidazopyridine derivatives and process for preparation thereof | [1993/11] | French: | Dérivés d'imidazopyridine et procédé de préparation | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 21.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/23] | 23.01.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/23] | Request for further processing for: | 18.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 18.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0245637 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [YD]EP0253310 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0291969 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0400835 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [Y]EP0420237 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0461039 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [AP]EP0468470 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY vol. 28, 1991, PROVO US pages 97 - 108 S. KLUTCHKO ET AL. | [AP] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 34, no. 11, November 1991, WASHINGTON US pages 3248 - 60 C. JOHN. BLANKLEY ET AL. |