EP0554507 - Fluid actuated, double acting machine for punching, cutting, bending or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA OGURA 2661, Hongo Ebina-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA OGURA 2661, Hongo Ebina-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Kiyoshi 529-4, Takakura Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/32] | Behn, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Lindenberg 34 D-82343 Pöcking / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115008.2 | 02.09.1992 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | JP19920003222 | 10.01.1992 Original published format: JP 322292 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554507 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554507 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23D29/00, B21D28/00, F15B15/20 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
B23D15/14 (EP,US);
B21D28/002 (EP,US);
B23D29/00 (EP,US);
B30B15/18 (EP,US);
F15B15/18 (EP,US);
F15B15/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53226 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | Doppelarbeitende hydraulische Vorrichtung zum Stanzen, Schneiden, Biegen usw. | [1993/32] | English: | Fluid actuated, double acting machine for punching, cutting, bending or the like | [1993/32] | French: | Appareil hydraulique à double action pour poinçonner, couper, plier etc. | [1993/32] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3410137 (BENTELER WERKE AG); | [Y]FR2624052 (AMADA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]FR1125999 (OFFRAY & CIE); | [A]FR1561810 |