EP0531884 - Stable iodophor in polyurethane foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states BECTON, DICKINSON & COMPANY One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kahn, Mohammad A. 10005 South Falcon Hurst Drive Sandy, Utah 84092 / US | 02 /
Hoang, Minh Q. 4905 Avant Circle Taylorsville, Utah 84118 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92115059.5 | 03.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | US19910756661 | 09.09.1991 Original published format: US 756661 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531884 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531884 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/12, A61L15/00 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
A01N59/12 (EP,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L15/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/12, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A61L15/26, C08L75/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Stabile Iodophor im Polyurethanschaum | [1993/11] | English: | Stable iodophor in polyurethane foam | [1993/11] | French: | Iodophore stable dans mousse de polyuréthane | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.07.1997 | [1998/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3810841 (RICHTER F); | [A]WO8201469 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]); | [Y]US4381380 (LEVEEN HARRY H [US], et al); | [A]WO8401102 (HYDROMER INC [US]); | [X]EP0385030 (LEVEEN HARRY H [US], et al); | [XP]EP0473026 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) |