EP0535392 - Diagnostic method for an electronically controlled fluid pressure brake installation of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing. Eichendorfstrasse 3 W-3013 Barsinghausen / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Mühlbergerstrasse 43 W-7300 Esslingen / DE | [1993/14] | Application number, filing date | 92115133.8 | 04.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | DE19914132767 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: DE 4132767 | [1993/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0535392 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0535392 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535392 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22, B60T8/00, B60T13/66 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B60T13/66 (EP);
B60T15/14 (EP);
B60T17/221 (EP);
B60T8/00 (EP);
B60T8/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose einer elektronisch geregelten Druckmittel-Bremseinrichtung eines Fahrzeuges | [1993/14] | English: | Diagnostic method for an electronically controlled fluid pressure brake installation of a vehicle | [1993/14] | French: | Procédé pour diagnostiquer une installation de freinage à fluide sous pression à commande électronique d'un véhicule | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3501179 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]); | [AD]DE4004502 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3337800 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0357922 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0399162 (WABCO GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2566729 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |