EP0531928 - Device for collecting liquids from several sources in a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curati, Roberto Liebermannstrasse 30 W-6070 Langen / DE | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/44] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH, Guerickestrasse 7 D-60486 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115328.4 | 08.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | DE19914130235 | 11.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4130235 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0531928 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0531928 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/02, B67D5/365, B67D5/60, F16N31/00 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
B67D7/0288 (EP);
B67D7/40 (EP);
B67D7/78 (EP);
F16N31/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | IE, PT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Sammeln der Flüssigkeit mehrerer Quellen in einem Sammelbehälter | [1993/11] | English: | Device for collecting liquids from several sources in a container | [1993/11] | French: | Dispositif pour la récuperation de liquides provenants de plusieures sources dans un récipient | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/14] | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2513627 ; | [XD]DE9102774U ; | [Y]US4993573 ; | [Y]US3674179 ; | [Y]US1662617 ; | [Y]US2204677 ; | [A]US4948014 ; | [A]US1886098 (MEAD HEDGLON) |