EP0533033 - Method for manufacturing a silver halide emulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubotera, Mitsuhiro Konica Corporation, 28 Horinouchi Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kajiwara, Makoto Konica Corporation, 28 Horinouchi Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115366.4 | 09.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910268488 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: JP 26848891 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533033 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/015 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
G03C1/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer Silberhalogenidemulsion | [1993/12] | English: | Method for manufacturing a silver halide emulsion | [1993/12] | French: | Procédé de production d'émulsion à l'halogénure d'argent | [1993/12] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/22] | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0291339 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0256781 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]EP0278510 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |