EP0587923 - High-frequency constant-current feeding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.R.D. CO. LTD. 110, Ooguchinaka-machi, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states U.R.D. CO. LTD. 110, Ooguchinaka-machi, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Owase, Joji 110, Ooguchinaka-machi, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115671.7 | 14.09.1992 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587923 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/392 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
H05B41/245 (EP);
H05B41/2822 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/12] | Title | German: | Hochfrequentes Konstantstromversorgungssystem | [1994/12] | English: | High-frequency constant-current feeding system | [1994/12] | French: | Système d'alimentation à haute fréquence et courant constant | [1994/12] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 13.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/05] | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0264135 ; | [Y]DE2056680 |